KY HB108 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 160.380 to remove aunt, uncle, son-in-law, and daughter-in-law from the definition of "relative" for purposes of employment; remove obsolete language regarding the employment of board member relatives; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to school employees and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 2, SFA 3, SFA 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 658 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 171 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 170 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-29Housereceived in House
2018-03-29Senate3rd reading, passed 20-17 with Committee Substitute(1) committee amendment (1-title) & floor amendments (1) (2) and (3)
2018-03-27Senatefloor amendment (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-27Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-22Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-22Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018
2018-03-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-20Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1-title)
2018-02-27Senateto Education (S)
2018-02-26Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-23House3rd reading, passed 83-0 with Committee Substitute
2018-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 23, 2018
2018-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-15Houseposted in committee
2018-01-04Houseto Education (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback