KS SB98 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating abortion practice; requiring certain physician information to be provided under the woman's-right-to-know act.
Title
Regulating abortion practice; requiring certain physician information to be provided under the woman's-right-to-know act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |