KS SB97 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 97 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Relating to taxation, income tax, rates, modifications.
Title
Substitute for SB 97 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Relating to taxation, income tax, rates, modifications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Introduced |