KS SB82 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the state banking code.
Title
Updating the state banking code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2019-03-11 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2019-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2019-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |