KS SB65 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing creditor sale of repossessed alcoholic liquors pledged as collateral for satisfaction of debt.
Title
Allowing creditor sale of repossessed alcoholic liquors pledged as collateral for satisfaction of debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kelly, Representative Powell and Representative Finney appointed as conferees |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers as conferees |
2017-03-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2017-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2017-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2017-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |