KS SB51 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 51 by Committee on Health and Human Services - Scheduling of controlled substance analog, controlled substances and new drugs.
Title
House Substitute for SB 51 by Committee on Health and Human Services - Scheduling of controlled substance analog, controlled substances and new drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 6 (Y: 117 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 6 (Y: 117 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 21, 2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Concannon and Representative Wilson appointed as conferees |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator V. Schmidt , Senator Bollier and Senator Kelly as conferees |
2017-03-22 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 6 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wilson was adopted |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Wilson |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S |
2017-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |