KS SB51 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
School districts; requiring only parental consent to dispense over-the-counter medication to students.
Title
School districts; requiring only parental consent to dispense over-the-counter medication to students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in House Committee | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-03-17 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-03-15 | Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 | |
2011-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education | |
2011-02-25 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Education | |
2011-02-24 | Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced |