KS SB478 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for wind energy conversion system obstruction lighting to mitigate the visual impact of such lighting systems.
Title
Establishing requirements for wind energy conversion system obstruction lighting to mitigate the visual impact of such lighting systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (proponents) Wednesday, March 9, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (opponents) Wednesday, March 9, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Utilities |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Utilities; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |