KS SB419 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, May 4, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, May 4, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas appraisal management company registration act.
Title
Amending the Kansas appraisal management company registration act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 116 Nay: 0 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, May 4, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 01, 2018 |
2018-04-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 116 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-04-27 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2018-04-02 | House | House Hearing: Monday, April 02, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-03-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-03-27 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 20, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |