KS SB408 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing consumption of beer and wine on the Kansas state fairgrounds and transferring moneys collected from the liquor enforcement tax to the state fair capital improvements fund.
Title
Allowing consumption of beer and wine on the Kansas state fairgrounds and transferring moneys collected from the liquor enforcement tax to the state fair capital improvements fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 5, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |