KS SB382 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making and concerning appropriations for fiscal years 2024, 2025, 2026, 2027 and 2028 for state agencies, increasing expenditure limitations, authorizing certain transfers, funding of the fiscal year 2024 salary increase for certain state employees, transferring funds from the legislature employment security fund of the legislative coordinating council to the university of Kansas and Wichita state university health collaboration fund of the university of Kansas, to the Wichita state university and university of Kansas health collaboration fund of Wichita state university and to the state general fund and authorizing certain expenditures from the build Kansas matching grant fund.
Title
Making and concerning appropriations for fiscal years 2024, 2025, 2026, 2027 and 2028 for state agencies, increasing expenditure limitations, authorizing certain transfers, funding of the fiscal year 2024 salary increase for certain state employees, transferring funds from the legislature employment security fund of the legislative coordinating council to the university of Kansas and Wichita state university health collaboration fund of the university of Kansas, to the Wichita state university and university of Kansas health collaboration fund of Wichita state university and to the state general fund and authorizing certain expenditures from the build Kansas matching grant fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 7, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 6, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |