KS SB382 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing requirement that wrecker and towing service providers file notices, publications and affidavits with the county clerk; requirements for towing vehicles from private property, ordinance or resolution.
Title
Repealing requirement that wrecker and towing service providers file notices, publications and affidavits with the county clerk; requirements for towing vehicles from private property, ordinance or resolution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2016-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2016-03-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-03-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2016, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance; Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Introduced |