KS SB363 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending statutes regulating the practice of barbering regarding licensure, examination and fees.
Title
Amending statutes regulating the practice of barbering regarding licensure, examination and fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-02-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |