KS SB361 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Affording public employees and professional employees certain rights with respect to withholding of public employee organization and professional employee organization dues.
Title
Affording public employees and professional employees certain rights with respect to withholding of public employee organization and professional employee organization dues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb361/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb361_00_0000.pdf |