KS SB353 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the allocation of sufficient school district moneys to improve academic performance of underachieving students.
Title
Requiring the allocation of sufficient school district moneys to improve academic performance of underachieving students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 17, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb353/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb353_00_0000.pdf |