KS SB336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Kansas reinvest in postsecondary education act.
Title
Creating the Kansas reinvest in postsecondary education act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |