KS SB336 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

House Substitute for SB 336 by Committee on Judiciary - Extending open records exceptions and requiring release of certain records by the secretary for children and families, regulating access to certain law enforcement audio and video recordings and requiring redactions of social security numbers in documents available for public inspection and copying.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Substitute for SB 336 by Committee on Judiciary - Extending open records exceptions and requiring release of certain records by the secretary for children and families, regulating access to certain law enforcement audio and video recordings and requiring redactions of social security numbers in documents available for public inspection and copying.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018
2018-05-04SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 07, 2018
2018-05-01SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-05-01SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
2018-04-30HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-30HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2018-04-02HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Finch, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees
2018-04-02SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Wilborn , Senator Lynn and Senator Haley as conferees
2018-03-29HouseHouse Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N
2018-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-02-22SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was adopted
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2018-01-30SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-29SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb336/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb336_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb336_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb336_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb336_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb336_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180222165625_816789/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180329105206_562560/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180430121336_825697/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180501150132_923815/

Bill Comments

feedback