KS SB330 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the fee limitations for certain department of wildlife, parks and tourism licenses, permits, stamps and other issues.
Title
Amending the fee limitations for certain department of wildlife, parks and tourism licenses, permits, stamps and other issues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb330/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb330_00_0000.pdf |