KS SB329 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 May 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 May 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying court orders relating to parents in juvenile offender cases and changing the statute of limitations on certain juvenile offenses.
Title
Clarifying court orders relating to parents in juvenile offender cases and changing the statute of limitations on certain juvenile offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 May 2014 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 09, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2014-05-02 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2014-04-30 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2014-03-26 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rubin, Representative Gonzalez and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator King , Senator Haley and Senator Smith as conferees |
2014-03-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Finch was adopted |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Finch |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-27 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 06, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2014-02-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2014-02-20 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |