KS SB322 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating application requirement and fee to appropriate surface water that otherwise leaves the state.
Title
Creating application requirement and fee to appropriate surface water that otherwise leaves the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 20, 2016, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/sb322/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/sb322_00_0000.pdf |