KS SB312 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; speedy trial; mandatory stay of mandate for certain appeals.
Title
Criminal procedure; speedy trial; mandatory stay of mandate for certain appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 19, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2014-03-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 05, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S CANCELED |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 05, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate Introduced |