KS SB283 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 31, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 31, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the governmental response to the COVID-19 pandemic in Kansas by extending the expanded use of telemedicine, the authority of the board of healing arts to grant certain temporary emergency licenses, the suspension of certain requirements related to medical care facilities and immunity from civil liability for certain healthcare providers and certain persons conducting business in this state for COVID-19 claims until March 31, 2022.
Title
Continuing the governmental response to the COVID-19 pandemic in Kansas by extending the expanded use of telemedicine, the authority of the board of healing arts to grant certain temporary emergency licenses, the suspension of certain requirements related to medical care facilities and immunity from civil liability for certain healthcare providers and certain persons conducting business in this state for COVID-19 claims until March 31, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 30 Nay: 10 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 96 Nay: 28 (Y: 96 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 31 Nay: 8 (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 96 Nay: 28 (Y: 96 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 31 Nay: 8 (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 31, 2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 31, 2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 30 Nay: 10 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 96 Nay: 28 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 18, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-03-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 31 Nay: 8 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hilderbrand was adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hilderbrand |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 2, 2021, 12:00 PM Room 346-S |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |