KS SB235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Substitute for SB 235 by Committee on Taxation - Providing for bonding authority rate limitations for municipal bonds, the issuance of short term no-fund warrant financing during emergency and the ability of the development finance authority to issue bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Substitute for SB 235 by Committee on Taxation - Providing for bonding authority rate limitations for municipal bonds, the issuance of short term no-fund warrant financing during emergency and the ability of the development finance authority to issue bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
2019-04-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-04-01HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-03-25SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Assessment and Taxation and referred to Committee of the Whole
2019-03-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-03-21SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback