KS SB213 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for state income taxation of retirement contributions by certain employees of the state board of regents.
Title
Providing for state income taxation of retirement contributions by certain employees of the state board of regents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb213/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb213_00_0000.pdf |