KS SB184 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Kansas intelligence fusion center.
Title
Authorizing the Kansas intelligence fusion center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 12, 2017 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 07, 2017 |
2017-04-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 09, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |