KS SB180 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for law enforcement agencies to request and receive files concerning applicants previously employed by another state or local law enforcement agency and establishing confidentiality of records contained in the central registry of all Kansas law enforcement officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for law enforcement agencies to request and receive files concerning applicants previously employed by another state or local law enforcement agency and establishing confidentiality of records contained in the central registry of all Kansas law enforcement officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 98 Nay: 23 (Y: 98 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018
2018-05-04SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018
2018-05-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-05-02SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-05-01HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 23
2018-05-01HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-05-01HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2018-04-02HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Finch, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees
2018-04-02SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Wilborn , Senator Lynn and Senator Haley as conferees
2018-03-29HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N
2018-02-12HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-12HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-02-08SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-08SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2017-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 07, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2017-03-06SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-23SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-02-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-10SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback