KS SB106 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - Senate Stricken from calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - Senate Stricken from calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credit for expenses paid for household and dependent care services necessary for gainful employment.
Title
Income tax credit for expenses paid for household and dependent care services necessary for gainful employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Stricken from calendar. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 27, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 548-S CANCELLED |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 27, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/sb106/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/sb106_00_0000.pdf |