KS S0553 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Recovering migrating natural gas. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
Recovering migrating natural gas. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-03-10 | Hearing: 3/11/2010, Thur., 8:00 am, Rm 144-S (cont) | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing: 3/04/2010, Thur., 8:20 am, Rm 144-S; Hearing: 3/10/2010, Wed., 8:30 am, Rm 144-S (cont) | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Natural Resources -SJ 1100 | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced -SJ 1097 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |