KS S0357 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1113
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1113
Summary
Authorizing secretary of administration to convey certain real estate on behalf of juvenile justice authority to city of Beloit. Effective date: 3/11/2010.
Title
Authorizing secretary of administration to convey certain real estate on behalf of juvenile justice authority to city of Beloit. Effective date: 3/11/2010.
Sponsors
Sen. Janis Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Approved by gov. -SJ 1113 | |
2010-02-23 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 1098 | |
2010-02-18 | FA: Passed; Yeas 122 Nays 0 -HJ 970 | |
2010-02-17 | COW: Be passed -HJ 956 | |
2010-02-12 | CR: Be passed by Local Government -HJ 919 | |
2010-02-05 | Hearing: Thurs., 2/11/2010, 3:30 PM, Rm 144-S | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Local Government -HJ 873 | |
2010-02-03 | Received and introduced -HJ 870 | |
2010-02-02 | COW: Be passed -SJ 981; EFA: Passed; Yeas 39 Nays 0 -SJ 982 | |
2010-01-27 | CR: Be passed by Ways and Means -SJ 958 | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 920 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced -SJ 916 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |