KS S0336 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by gov. -SJ 902
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by gov. -SJ 902
Summary
Reconciling amendments. Effective date: 6/04/2009.
Title
Reconciling amendments. Effective date: 6/04/2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by gov. -SJ 902 | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 902 | |
2009-05-11 | Engrossed -SJ 902 | |
2009-05-08 | Concurred; Yeas 34 Nays 0 -SJ 878 | |
2009-05-08 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -HJ 744; EFA, amt. & debate: Am.; passed as am.; Yeas 115 Nays 0 -HJ 744 | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to COW -HJ 696 | |
2009-05-01 | Received and introduced -HJ 695 | |
2009-05-01 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -SJ 774; COW: Be passed -SJ 794; EFA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 795 | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to COW -SJ 765 | |
2009-04-29 | Introduced -SJ 761 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |