KS S0301 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Amendments to statutes relating to monumentation of corners in land surveys and recording such surveys. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Amendments to statutes relating to monumentation of corners in land surveys and recording such surveys. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-03-02 | Withdrawn from calendar, rereferred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 1116 | |
2010-02-17 | CR: Substitute be passed by Federal and State Affairs -SJ 1047 | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 264 | |
2009-03-04 | Introduced -SJ 259 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |