KS S0246 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee

Summary

Allowing the issuance of a special permit to conduct tastings of alcoholic beverages. Effective date: Statute Bk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the issuance of a special permit to conduct tastings of alcoholic beverages. Effective date: Statute Bk.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Died in committee
2009-03-04 Hearing: 3/10/2009, Tues., 10:30 am, Rm 136-N
2009-02-10 Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 139
2009-02-09 Introduced -SJ 127

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback