KS S0068 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Approved by gov. -SJ 756
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Approved by gov. -SJ 756
Summary
Judges and justices, mandatory retirement at 75, may elect to serve to end of current term. Effective date: 7/01/2009.
Title
Judges and justices, mandatory retirement at 75, may elect to serve to end of current term. Effective date: 7/01/2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Approved by gov. -SJ 756 | |
2009-04-10 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 756 | |
2009-04-03 | Reengrossed -SJ 708 | |
2009-04-02 | Adptd CCR on senate bill; Yeas 31 Nays 7 -SJ 617 | |
2009-04-02 | Adptd CCR; Yeas 98 Nays 26 -HJ 522 | |
2009-03-30 | Acceded; apptd Kinzer, Whitham, Pauls -HJ 448 | |
2009-03-30 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Owens, Schmidt,D., Haley -SJ 533 | |
2009-03-25 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 432; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 95 Nays 30 -HJ 434 | |
2009-03-19 | CR: Be passed as am. by Judiciary -HJ 345 | |
2009-03-11 | Hearing: Thurs., 3/12/09, 3:30 PM, Rm 143-N | |
2009-03-04 | Hearing: Mon., 3/09/09, 3:30 PM, Rm 143-N | |
2009-02-16 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 165 | |
2009-02-13 | Received and introduced -HJ 164 | |
2009-02-16 | Engrossed -SJ 182 | |
2009-02-12 | COW: Be am.; be passed as am. -SJ 167; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 24 Nays 14 -SJ 170 | |
2009-02-09 | CR: Be passed by Judiciary -SJ 135 | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 61 | |
2009-01-22 | Introduced -SJ 53 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |