KS S0044 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Approved by gov. -SJ 756
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Approved by gov. -SJ 756
Summary
Civil procedure; Kansas false claims act; rules of evidence, admissibility of prior acts or offenses; habeas corpus, infectious disease. Effective date: 4/30/2009.
Title
Civil procedure; Kansas false claims act; rules of evidence, admissibility of prior acts or offenses; habeas corpus, infectious disease. Effective date: 4/30/2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Approved by gov. -SJ 756 | |
2009-04-10 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 756 | |
2009-04-03 | Engrossed -SJ 699 | |
2009-04-02 | Adptd CCR on senate bill; Yeas 39 Nays 0 -SJ 594 | |
2009-04-01 | Adptd CCR; Yeas 124 Nays 0 -HJ 495 | |
2009-03-25 | Acceded; apptd Kinzer, Whitham, Pauls -HJ 439 | |
2009-03-25 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Owens, Schmidt,D., Haley -SJ 508 | |
2009-03-25 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 125 Nays 0 -HJ 422 | |
2009-03-24 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 407 | |
2009-03-18 | CR: Be passed as am. by Judiciary -HJ 320 | |
2009-03-04 | Hearing: Tues., 3/10/09, 3:30 PM, Rm 143-N | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 82 | |
2009-01-29 | Received and introduced -HJ 79 | |
2009-01-28 | FA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 75 | |
2009-01-27 | COW: Be passed -SJ 73 | |
2009-01-26 | CR: Be passed by Judiciary -SJ 63 | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 48 | |
2009-01-16 | Introduced -SJ 46 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |