KS HR6028 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 96-29)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - House Enrolled on Thursday, May 28, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 96-29)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - House Enrolled on Thursday, May 28, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulating and commending Andy Tompkins for his many years of service to the people of Kansas.
Title
Congratulating and commending Andy Tompkins for his many years of service to the people of Kansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | House Enrolled on Thursday, May 28, 2015 |
2015-05-26 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2015-05-21 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hr6028/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hr6028_enrolled.pdf |