KS HB2751 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Kansas department for aging and disability services to condition or restrict a disability service provider license, granting the secretary authority to grant regulation waivers unrelated to health and safety and authorizing correction orders and civil fines to be appealed to the secretary.
Title
Authorizing the Kansas department for aging and disability services to condition or restrict a disability service provider license, granting the secretary authority to grant regulation waivers unrelated to health and safety and authorizing correction orders and civil fines to be appealed to the secretary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 111 Nay: 9 (Y: 111 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate Calendar |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 27, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 111 Nay: 9 |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2024-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-07 | House | House Introduced |