KS HB2660 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 April 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 April 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the licensure of maternity centers and child care facilities.
Title
Relating to the licensure of maternity centers and child care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 5 (Y: 118 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 5 (Y: 118 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 April 2012 | |
2012-04-25 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 06, 2012 | |
2012-03-30 | Engrossed on Friday, 30 March 2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Concurred with amendments; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-20 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 546-S | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | |
2012-02-22 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-22 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 5 | |
2012-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Otto was rejected | |
2012-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Otto | |
2012-02-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services | |
2012-02-10 | Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 784-DOB | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced |