KS HB2658 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replacing the list of standard conditions of probation and allowing for special conditions of probation.
Title
Replacing the list of standard conditions of probation and allowing for special conditions of probation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2022-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-02-09 | House | House Introduced |