KS HB2606 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the filling of a vacancy in the office of state treasurer and insurance commissioner by statewide district convention.
Title
Provide for the filling of a vacancy in the office of state treasurer and insurance commissioner by statewide district convention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2020-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Elections |
2020-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Elections |
2020-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Elections; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 212-N |
2020-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2020-02-10 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2606/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2606_00_0000.pdf |