KS HB2589 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating prohibition on certain investments in business operations in Sudan by the Kansas public employees retirement system.
Title
Eliminating prohibition on certain investments in business operations in Sudan by the Kansas public employees retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 17, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 152-S |
2014-02-10 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 152-S |
2014-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Pensions and Benefits |
2014-02-07 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hb2589/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2589_00_0000.pdf |