KS HB2557 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 06 April 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 06 April 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial vehicles' requiring annual registration in lieu of tax payment.
Title
Commercial vehicles' requiring annual registration in lieu of tax payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 8 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 8 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor on Friday, 06 April 2012 | |
2012-03-30 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 30, 2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Concurred with amendments; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-15 | Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 8 | |
2012-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-23 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed on Thursday, 23 February 2012 | |
2012-02-23 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-02-17 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 783-DSOB | |
2012-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced |