KS HB2556 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Rereferred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation
Pending: House Interstate Cooperation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Rereferred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation
Pending: House Interstate Cooperation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding medical assistance eligibility and enacting the cutting healthcare costs for all Kansans act.
Title
Expanding medical assistance eligibility and enacting the cutting healthcare costs for all Kansans act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Rereferred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation |
2024-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Interstate Cooperation; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-03-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Referred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation |
2024-03-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 1:00 PM Room 112-N |
2024-01-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-19 | House | House Introduced |