KS HB2525 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing non-cooperation with child support from requirements for food and child care assistance eligibility and exempting adults enrolled in school from the 20-hour-per-week work requirement for child care assistance eligibility for a limited time.
Title
Removing non-cooperation with child support from requirements for food and child care assistance eligibility and exempting adults enrolled in school from the 20-hour-per-week work requirement for child care assistance eligibility for a limited time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed - Yea: 53 Nay: 66 (Y: 53 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed Yea: 53 Nay: 66 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Children and Seniors |
2022-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2022-01-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2022-01-20 | House | House Introduced |