KS HB2504 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that only physical paper ballots be reviewed when conducting election audits.
Title
Requiring that only physical paper ballots be reviewed when conducting election audits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2024-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2024-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2024-01-16 | House | House Introduced |