KS HB2496 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 30 March 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 30 March 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applying the Kansas law enforcement training act to investigators of the juvenile justice authority and department of corrections.
Title
Applying the Kansas law enforcement training act to investigators of the juvenile justice authority and department of corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Approved by Governor on Friday, 30 March 2012 | |
2012-03-26 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012 | |
2012-03-15 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-03-12 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-20 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-17 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-17 | Engrossed on Friday, 17 February 2012 | |
2012-02-16 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-02-16 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-02-10 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2012-01-20 | Introduced |