KS HB2488 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, 04 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, 04 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas electric transmission authority and the purpose and composition of the authority.
Title
Kansas electric transmission authority and the purpose and composition of the authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 107 Nay: 15 (Y: 107 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 108 Nay: 13 (Y: 108 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 108 Nay: 13 (Y: 108 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, 04 April 2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 01, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 107 Nay: 15 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-02-12 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 108 Nay: 13 |
2014-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-01-27 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2014-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy and Environment |
2014-01-23 | House | House Introduced |