KS HB2442 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB2442 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice--Special sentencing rule for third or subsequent flee and elude cases.
Title
Substitute for HB2442 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice--Special sentencing rule for third or subsequent flee and elude cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 12 (Y: 111 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 12 (Y: 111 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014 |
2014-04-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 11, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 11, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-02-27 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 111 Nay: 12 |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2014-01-27 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2014-01-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2014-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 112-N-CANCELLED |
2014-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-16 | House | House Introduced |