KS HB2360 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the division of the state employee health benefits plan in the department of administration.
Title
Establishing the division of the state employee health benefits plan in the department of administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 99 Nay: 26 (Y: 99 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-04-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 99 Nay: 26 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on General Government Budget |
2017-03-24 | House | House Hearing: Friday, March 24, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 218-N |
2017-03-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2017-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | House Introduced |