KS HB2339 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 17 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 17 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Combining life insurance with certain additional riders such as specified illness, hospital indemnity or other fixed indemnity.
Title
Combining life insurance with certain additional riders such as specified illness, hospital indemnity or other fixed indemnity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 116 Nay: 4 (Y: 116 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 17 April 2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, 08 April 2013 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 116 Nay: 4 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed |
2013-04-05 | House | House Point of order was raised. Conference committee report was ruled in order. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Longbine and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees |
2013-03-26 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Shultz , Representative Hermanson and Representative Finney as conferees |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2013-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 152-S |
2013-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2013-02-14 | House | House Introduced |