KS HB2322 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 10 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 10 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the division of health of the department of health and environment.
Title
Relating to the division of health of the department of health and environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 6 (Y: 118 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 6 (Y: 118 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 10 April 2013 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 05, 2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 6 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, 27 February 2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2013-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2013-02-13 | House | House Introduced |